FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S NETHERBURY

Charity number: 1147441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £5.48k £3.97k £3.97k £4.33k £3.94k
Total expenditure £791 £788 £787 £7.07k £2.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A