Financial history BIRMINGHAM PHAB CAMPS

Charity number: 502073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £126.67k £114.68k £116.14k £95.99k £78.69k
Total expenditure £127.91k £118.15k £134.67k £3.04k £110.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A