NORWICH FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1143528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 27 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 27 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 08 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 11 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 11 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2015 27 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 27 August 2016 On time Download