Trustees NORWICH FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1143528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEIR ROBERT HOUNSOME Chair 21 January 2015
None on record
Rebecca Joyce Paraschivu Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
David John Osborne Trustee 21 September 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF TAVERHAM
Received: On time
Guy Warner Beckingham Trustee 05 July 2022
None on record
Katherine Davies Trustee 23 March 2021
THE MSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Fiona Heather Haworth Trustee 01 February 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. PETER MANCROFT WITH ST. JOHN MADDERMARKET, NORWICH
Received: On time
Jonathan Thorne Trustee 19 November 2019
ALIVE UK
Overdue by 138 days
Rachael Graham Trustee 19 November 2019
None on record