NORWICH FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1143528
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/10/2015 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019
Total gross income £43.39k £56.51k £65.26k £65.22k £75.31k
Total expenditure £56.96k £54.27k £54.73k £60.71k £65.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A