Accounts and annual returns KEBLE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1143997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 12 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 July 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 23 July 2019 53 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 05 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 05 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2016 01 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 01 March 2017 On time Download Open in new window