Trustees KEBLE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1143997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

51 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir Jonathan Phillips Chair 30 August 2011
OXFORD PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA TRUST
Received: On time
THE OXFORD BACH CHOIR SUPPORT TRUST
Received: On time
THE KEBLE ASSOCIATION ICW OXFORD UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
ESMEE FAIRBAIRN FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Professor Helen Byrne Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Stephen Andrew Cooke Trustee 08 February 2021
None on record
Dr Alfonso Bueno-Orovio Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Dr Sabrina Martin Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Sarah Knowles Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Professor David Downs Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
Dr Kirsten Macfarlane Trustee 01 July 2019
None on record
Professor chas bountra Trustee 21 April 2019
None on record
Dr Felix Charles Penrice Leach Trustee 01 January 2019
OXFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF EDUCATION
Received: On time
Dr Jeremy Fix Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Professor Alexander Lvovsky Trustee 10 September 2018
None on record
Professor Bernardo Cuenca Grau Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
PROFESSOR URSULA COOPE Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Professor Robert Klose Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR STEPHEN FLETCHER Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
PROFESSOR FRANCOIS CARON Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record
Dr BETH GREENHOUGH Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Prof Jeremy William Tomlinson Trustee 04 August 2014
None on record
Dr JAMES GOUDKAMP Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
Professor Andras Juhasz Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
DR KAZBI SOONAWALLA Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR ULRIKE GRUNEBERG Trustee 25 April 2013
None on record
DR NICOLA GARDINI Trustee 25 April 2013
None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL NEWMAN Trustee 25 April 2013
None on record
DR MORGAN CLARKE Trustee 25 April 2013
None on record
DR MATTHEW BEVIS Trustee 25 April 2013
None on record
SARAH WHATMORE Trustee 01 October 2012
None on record
JENNIFER SUSAN TUDGE Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
DR LISA MARIE BENDALL Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR RICHARD WASHINGTON Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
DR DANIEL MCDERMOTT Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
DR ANNA-MARIA SUSHEILA MISRA Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
DR EDWARD HARCOURT Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR STEPHEN FAULKNER Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
DR SIMON JULIAN BEVAN BUTT Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR VIKTOR MAYER-SCHONBERGER Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR HARRY LAURENCE ANDERSON Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR MARKUS BOCKMUEHL Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR DIANE MAREE PURKISS Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
DR STEPHEN ERIC KEARSEY Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR EDWIN PEEL Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
Dr MICHAEL NORMAN HAWCROFT Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR GESINE REINERT Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR TIMOTHY JOHN JENKINSON Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
Dr ALASDAIR PETER ROGERS Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR GUI-QIANG CHEN Trustee 27 September 2011
None on record
Ian Wallace Archer Trustee 27 September 2011
THE CENTRE FOR MEDIEVAL AND RENAISSANCE STUDIES LIMITED
Received: On time
DR HOWARD SMITH Trustee 30 August 2011
None on record
PROFESSOR CHRISTOPHER GOSDEN Trustee 30 August 2011
None on record
Dr KEVIN SHEPPARD Trustee 30 August 2011
None on record