LANYT THEATRE

Charity number: 1145769
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 10 May 2020 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 10 May 2020 406 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 04 September 2018 157 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 24 August 2017 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required