LANYT THEATRE

Charity number: 1145769
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £55 £143 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £129 £143 £220 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A