THE CHALFONT ST PETER COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1144104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £31.04k £34.12k £26.18k £25.56k £46.54k
Total expenditure £16.98k £18.20k £14.48k £16.98k £17.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £16.07k N/A
Income from government grants £15.32k £15.50k £15.92k N/A £41.80k