THE CHALFONT ST PETER COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity number: 1144104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Agnes Mary Neill Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Meenakshi Westhead Trustee 20 April 2020 None on record
Peter Brayshaw Trustee 20 April 2020 None on record
Heather Trobridge Trustee 14 March 2016 None on record
Antony Marr Trustee 01 September 2013 None on record
HAZEL PIGGOTT Trustee 03 July 2012 None on record
Susan Woodrow Chair 23 April 2013 None on record
Sally Buckley Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Sue Amos Trustee 14 March 2016 None on record
KAREN DICKSON Trustee 03 October 2011
MARIA TAYLOR CHARITY Received: On time
CHALFONT ST. PETER COMMUNITY CENTRE Received: On time