MARKYATE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1145170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £93.69k £92.21k £74.67k £76.82k £66.34k
Total expenditure £57.82k £37.87k £66.99k £73.49k £68.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A