MARKYATE BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1145170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Lesley Salmon Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record
Jeremy Bottrill Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
Ruth Kieran Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
REV PHILLIP COFFIN Chair 27 March 2018 None on record
James Salmon Trustee 04 April 2017 None on record
Steven McCurdy Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Jacqueline Hewitson Trustee 27 April 2017 None on record