PROMISE WORKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1145692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 15 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 15 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 14 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 14 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 22 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 22 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 26 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2016 10 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 17 July 2017 On time Download