PROMISE WORKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1145692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Guy Elliott Trustee 17 April 2020 None on record
Lucinda Martin Trustee 31 March 2017 None on record
Kevin Anthony O'Donnell Trustee 26 August 2016 None on record
Madeleine Conway Trustee 03 January 2017 None on record
Tula Knight Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record
Carolyn Drew Trustee 27 November 2017 None on record
Robert Peto Chair 28 August 2016 None on record
Andrew Robert Holmes Trustee 17 April 2020 None on record