PROMISE WORKS LIMITED

Charity number: 1145692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £11.21k £123.12k £88.80k £126.45k £186.53k
Total expenditure £6.06k £21.47k £66.31k £131.83k £174.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.18k £0 N/A N/A N/A