THE FROEBEL TRUST

Charity number: 1145128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £456.17k £488.39k £658.89k £601.88k £511.31k
Total expenditure £875.78k £819.90k £1.11m £935.49k £689.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £2.16k £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £656.74k £601.88k £509.78k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £1.53k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £993.15k £875.40k £595.23k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £120.26k £60.09k £93.91k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £99.63k £36.61k £15.18k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £213.78k £439.01k £265.52k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £120.26k £60.09k £93.91k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0