CANOLFAN GYMUNEDOL YSTRADOWEN COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1147865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £95.25k £79.72k £112.89k £137.91k £150.16k
Total expenditure £74.87k £101.87k £115.54k £134.66k £94.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £35.44k £38.06k £33.39k £59.32k N/A