FRIENDS OF PLAS DOL-Y-MOCH

Charity number: 1147715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 14 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required