FRIENDS OF PLAS DOL-Y-MOCH

Charity number: 1147715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Leigh Trustee 20 December 2013 None on record
MIKE BALLINGER Chair 27 February 2012 None on record
PAUL TUFFIN Trustee 29 January 2018 None on record
Ingunn Hutt Trustee 21 January 2019 None on record
Mike Coult Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
ANDY WALMSLEY Trustee 27 February 2012
UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN COVENTRY Received: On time
JACQUIE MOLLOY Trustee 27 February 2012 None on record
RUTH SNOW Trustee 27 February 2012 None on record
JO-ANN BRAKE BA HONs Trustee 27 February 2012 None on record