UNIVERSITY OF SUSSEX STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1147242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annie O'Connor Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Lindsay Neville Powell Thomas Trustee 20 October 2017
THE MANDELA SCHOLARSHIP FUND Received: On time
Paris Palmano Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Muhammad Ijlal Khalid Trustee 24 June 2019 None on record
Sarah Osborn Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Jean-Luc Bressard Trustee 14 September 2018 None on record
Nehaal Bajwa Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Connor Moylett Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Nisreen Fox Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record
Roseanne Steffen Trustee 17 July 2020 None on record
Harry Peter Bartholomew Jenkinson Trustee 16 June 2020 None on record