HIGHBRIDGE AREA FOODBANK

Charity number: 1147076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maxine Elizabeth Bashford Trustee 28 June 2018
THE PARISH OF THREE SAINTS Received: On time
Rev Richard Allen Trustee 09 May 2017 None on record
Rev Kathleen Allen MTh Trustee 25 May 2014 None on record
John Kempton Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
REV GRAHAM ROBERT WITTS MA Trustee 28 June 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW, BURNHAM-ON-SEA Received: On time
ALUN DAVIES Trustee 28 May 2013 None on record
Rev Steven Andrew Bennett Trustee 23 June 2021
WESTON-SUPER-MARE AND BURNHAM-ON-SEA METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
Helen Dawn Tania Groves Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
David Laing Dick Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Daniel Bell Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Vivien Evans Trustee 28 June 2018 None on record
NICHOLAS TIMOTHY BASHFORD Chair 30 July 2013 None on record