Financial history EAST SIDE YOUTH CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1147968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £10.42k £10.64k £14.17k £21.05k £19.85k
Total expenditure £16.85k £16.25k £18.13k £16.49k £12.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £500 £3.00k £10.00k