Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITY ASSETS PLUS

Charity number: 1148814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 17 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 20 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 20 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 01 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 07 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 02 February 2017 On time Download Open in new window