GILLINGHAM FOODBANK

Charity number: 1146565
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
gordon clowrey Trustee 30 January 2018
THE SANCTUARY - 24/7 WORSHIP, PRAYER AND PROPHECY Received: On time
Clive Roy Ozzard Trustee 18 October 2021 None on record
Rev Philippa Mary Sargent Trustee 26 August 2020
ST MARY'S STURMINSTER NEWTON CHURCH TRUST Received: On time
BISSELLS ESTATE Received: On time
VICTOR LESLIE TRUST Received: On time
CHARITY OF HARRY SAMUEL SENIOR Received: On time
Robert Philip Rickards Trustee 29 February 2012
YEOVIL AND BLACKMORE VALE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Lewis Buckwell Trustee 16 January 2020
YEOVIL AND BLACKMORE VALE METHODIST CIRCUIT
HANNAH GIBBONS Chair 29 February 2012 None on record