BERKSHIRE COUNTY BLIND SOCIETY

Charity number: 1146413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 19 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 16 December 2016 On time Download