BERKSHIRE COUNTY BLIND SOCIETY

Charity number: 1146413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £369.64k £337.47k £306.81k £657.63k £306.56k
Total expenditure £308.68k £371.13k £367.83k £568.16k £657.22k
Income from government contracts £70.04k £0 £81.05k £78.91k £71.61k
Income from government grants £0 £81.82k £4.47k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £481.61k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £122.39k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £53.64k N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £437.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £537.74k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £30.42k N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £9.95k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A