BERKSHIRE COUNTY BLIND SOCIETY

Charity number: 1146413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Frances Pape Trustee 29 September 2017 None on record
DAVID JOHN FEW Trustee 12 March 2012
READING BLUE COAT SCHOOL Received: On time
GREGORY CHARLES WILKINSON Chair 31 August 2016
ROTARY CLUB OF READING MATINS' CHARITY Received: On time
RIVERTIME BOAT TRUST LIMITED Received: 39 days late
Jane Maskell Trustee 29 January 2020 None on record
MR DON REED Trustee 12 March 2012 None on record
MARTIN JOHN GUBB Trustee 30 September 2015
SPORTSABLE Received: On time
IAN ALEXANDER FRASER Trustee 10 December 2013 None on record