Financial history WESTNEWTON PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £66.03k £63.62k £61.98k £86.73k £70.54k
Total expenditure £59.24k £59.05k £68.30k £71.07k £71.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £40.16k £61.56k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A