Accounts and annual returns WESTNEWTON PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1147216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 26 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 26 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 23 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 18 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window