Trustees WESTNEWTON PRE SCHOOL
Charity number: 1147216
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Scott | Chair | 25 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Robyn Miller | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emily wood | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne parnaby | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
anette thompson | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Maria Harrison | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.