Financial history YOUTH UNITED FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1147952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £400.00k £506.25k £5.17m £123.25k £195.01k
Total expenditure £320.00k £572.77k £5.22m £129.42k £102.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400.00k £325.00k £5.17m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 £437 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £506.25k £5.17m N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £3 £151 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £572.77k £5.22m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £15.38k £17.47k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £328.01k £4.49m N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A