Accounts and annual returns EPPING FOREST COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1148539
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 11 November 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 11 November 2021 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 11 November 2021 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 11 November 2021 407 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 14 January 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 14 January 2020 106 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window