Financial history EPPING FOREST COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1148539
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £525.25k £570.23k £574.59k £575.24k £544.59k
Total expenditure £532.43k £632.22k £647.27k £644.51k £532.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £89.60k £139.37k £154.18k
Income from government grants £281.22k £174.57k £253.60k £272.34k £310.38k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.10k £205.53k £6.54k £3.56k £3.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £523.03k £361.14k £567.92k £571.39k £2.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £145 £137 £295 £0
Income - Other £115 £3.42k £0 £0 £2.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £532.43k £632.22k £647.27k £40.25k £41.74k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £565.33k £490.58k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £14.00k £7.27k £9.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £38.93k £0