DUNSTABLE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1148632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 21 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 19 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required