DUNSTABLE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1148632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN SUTTON Chair 31 May 2012 None on record
Rev Ricky Turner Trustee 19 September 2019
9TH DUNSTABLE (ST AUGUSTINE'S) SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
MICHAEL FREEMAN Trustee 31 May 2012 None on record
Clive Cook Trustee 31 May 2012 None on record
STUART DOUGLAS Trustee 31 January 2021 None on record
John Roy Newland Trustee 31 January 2021 None on record
Mark Stocker Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
MAJOR STEPHEN BREVITT Trustee 20 September 2017 None on record