DUNSTABLE FOODBANK

Charity number: 1148632
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £15.75k £15.15k £15.82k £14.55k £46.20k
Total expenditure £6.01k £6.09k £8.73k £18.90k £22.60k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A