Financial history CTU COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1148689
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £763.87k £348.27k £348.27k £355.56k £129.25k
Total expenditure £434.64k £589.85k £589.85k £175.89k £97.63k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £240.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £1.62k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £522.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £240.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £562.86k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A