Trustees ABERYSTWYTH UNIVERSITY STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1150576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mx Aisleen Sturrock Chair 01 July 2022
PRIFYSGOL ABERYSTWYTH
Received: On time
Cameron Curry Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Dafydd Jones Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Rachel Barwise Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Gary Coulsby Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Manners Trustee 01 July 2021
None on record
Jon Allsopp Trustee 05 February 2021
None on record
Dr. Debra Jane Croft Trustee 04 November 2019
None on record
Alan Roberts Trustee 17 March 2017
None on record
Ryan Beasley Trustee 17 March 2017
None on record