MACCABI LONDON BRADY RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1149701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOEL NATHAN Trustee 03 January 2013
LONDON MACCABI RECREATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
MACCABI GB Received: On time
ANDREW LANDESBERG Trustee 16 October 2013 None on record
JASON LEEK Trustee 06 February 2014 None on record
NATALIE KENTON Trustee 13 January 2015 None on record
David Kyte Chair 11 September 2012
LONDON MACCABI RECREATIONAL TRUST Received: On time
Lee Glassar Trustee 27 February 2018 None on record