Accounts and annual returns DENVILLE HALL 2012

Charity number: 1148968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window