Financial history DENVILLE HALL 2012

Charity number: 1148968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.45m £2.12m £2.21m £2.90m £2.52m
Total expenditure £2.93m £2.45m £2.49m £2.48m £2.52m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £90.33k
Income - Donations and legacies £453.54k £201.66k £106.82k £632.98k £285.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.62m £1.83m £1.97m £1.83m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £260.21k
Income - Investment £302.76k £303.20k £272.73k £295.14k £312.28k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £90.33k
Income - Legacies £51.39k £0 £0 £497.29k £25.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.81m £2.37m £2.43m £2.47m £2.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £123.11k £77.36k £61.39k £12.96k £13.70k
Expenditure - Governance £14.35k £0 £18.00k £0 £18.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £9.45k £0 £13.91k £12.61k £13.70k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0