Trustees DENVILLE HALL 2012

Charity number: 1148968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Benjamin Chair 12 February 2019
None on record
James William Drever Hope Trustee 22 October 2021
None on record
Diana Maria Howard Trustee 13 July 2021
None on record
Lisa Ann Bowerman Trustee 07 April 2020
None on record
Michael Henry Shelton Trustee 07 April 2020
None on record
Malcolm Sinclair Trustee 12 February 2019
THE ACT FOR CHANGE PROJECT
Received: On time
HEMLATA BOUNTRA Trustee 07 July 2015
THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN & ARBORETUM
Received: On time
RICHARD LANGLEY BERRY Trustee 25 March 2014
None on record
DEREK LAMDEN Trustee 05 August 2013
None on record
LOUISA RIX Trustee 05 August 2013
None on record