Accounts and annual returns ARK CANCER CENTRE CHARITY

Charity number: 1149758
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 November 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 December 2020 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window