TROWBRIDGE TOWN HALL TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1157085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £35.44k £133.97k £185.57k £205.24k £281.79k
Total expenditure £46.55k £109.61k £205.39k £155.97k £247.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £96.54k £0 £2.58k N/A
Income from government grants £5.13k £0 £74.20k £46.28k £67.92k