Accounts and annual returns THE CONGREGATION AT GERMAN CHRIST CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1149991
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 02 December 2021 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 02 December 2021 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 March 2021 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 23 March 2021 174 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 21 December 2019 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 21 December 2019 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 13 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2016 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 05 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window