Trustees THE CONGREGATION AT GERMAN CHRIST CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1149991
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Lars Klehn Trustee 01 December 2021
SYNOD OF GERMAN-SPEAKING LUTHERAN, REFORMED AND UNITED CONGREGATIONS IN GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
sybille de vegvar Trustee 01 December 2021
None on record
UDO BAUER Trustee 01 November 2021
GERMAN WELFARE COUNCIL
Received: On time
DR URSULA VOGT Trustee 17 May 2015
None on record
DR Arnold Ludwig Holle Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
Michael Gruenert Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
Tina Armbrust Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
KARIN PURCELL Trustee 27 November 2012
None on record