Financial history THE CONGREGATION AT GERMAN CHRIST CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1149991
Charity reporting is up to date (63 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £107.37k £117.94k £129.31k £127.32k £91.86k
Total expenditure £104.02k £99.43k £93.31k £108.83k £93.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A