Accounts and annual returns ST GERMANS PRIORY

Charity number: 1151027
Charity reporting is overdue by 266 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Overdue by 266 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 01 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 01 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 01 April 2022 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 12 December 2019 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required