Trustees ST GERMANS PRIORY

Charity number: 1151027
Charity reporting is overdue by 287 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr RICHARD ALUN LAUGHARNE Chair 16 December 2012
None on record
Dr Ann Demaine Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Brenda Daw Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
Joanna May Patricia Cook Trustee 01 June 2017
THE FRIENDS OF ST ENDELLION CHURCH
Received: On time
Mr Bob Foulkes Trustee 23 May 2015
None on record
Fiona Bristow Trustee 01 March 2013
None on record